skip to content

Rodriguez, Jennifer Mandado

CPSO#: 87634

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cebuano, English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Santos Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 16 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018