skip to content

Rodriguez, Carlos Horacio

CPSO#: 29904

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 May 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Phone: 416-742-0680 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C.H. Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rodriguez ( CPSO# 29904 )

Business Address:
203 - 2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 531-8760

Business Address:
202 - 106 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Phone Number: (416) 742-0680

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Records are located at Docudavit and Etobicoke Brampton Sleep Clinic
Date Received: 01 Jun 2021


Address: 28 Eugene St North York, ON M6B 3Z4 or Tel: 416-781-9083 / Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 25 Jul 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 1, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Records are located at Docudavit and Etobicoke Brampton Sleep Clinic