skip to content

Rodin, Danielle Lee

CPSO#: 98171

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
Room 7-611
700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-6513
Fax: 416-946-6566 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Danielle Rodin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rodin ( CPSO# 98171 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-6513

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIELLE LEE RODIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018