skip to content

Rodgerson, James Stuart

CPSO#: 17598

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jul 1960

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients should contact Docudavit Solutions to request a copy of their medical record at Tel: 416-781-9083, Fax: 1-866-297-9338, Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 26 Oct 2020

Instructions/Address:
Iron Mountain
90 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5X3
Date Received: 06 Feb 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2020

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: October 24, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Download Full Document (PDF)