skip to content

Rodger, Norman Wilson

CPSO#: 20781

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 323 St George St London ON N6A 3A9
Date Received: 10 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018