skip to content

Rochowski, Andrzej

CPSO#: 96474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean ON  K2H 6L5
Phone: (613) 596-1568
Fax: (613) 596-6764 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Hematology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Brewer Park Covid Screening Centre
100 Brewer Way, Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1S 5T1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrzej Rochowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2016 Active
             Dr. Andrzej Rochowski may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.