skip to content

Rochon, Matthew David

CPSO#: 98004

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-254-5577 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matthew Rochon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rochon ( CPSO# 98004 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW DAVID ROCHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017