skip to content

Roche, Susan Lucy

CPSO#: 85973

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Congenital Cardiac Centre
Department of Cardiology
5N 521 - 585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3266
Fax: (416) 340-5014 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:23 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 31 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2019 Active
             Dr. Susan Lucy Roche may practise medicine independently in cardiology.