First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2019 |