skip to content

Robinson, Matthew John

CPSO#: 90234

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective:25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2009 to 27 Mar 2009
EL - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Nov 2011 to 23 Dec 2011
EL - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2011