skip to content

Robinson, Marie-Eve

CPSO#: 97952

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE-EVE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 04 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2017