skip to content

Robins, Ronald Norman

CPSO#: 24883

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. N. Robins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Medical Records Department 800 Comissioners Rd E London Health Sciences Centre London ON N6A 5W9 and 268 Grosvenor St St. Joesph's Health Care Centre London ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018