Robins, Jason (CPSO#: 93650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
MG-130c, 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4339 Ext. 87708
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Robins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rabbani ( CPSO# 102605)
Dr. J. Robins ( CPSO# 93650 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
AG-46, 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4339

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ROBINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2016