skip to content

Robinette, Michael Allan

CPSO#: 27639

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M.A.Robinette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital 200 Elizabeth St Toronto, ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 10 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2019