skip to content

Beardsley, Robin Maud

CPSO#: 58240

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Westend Family Care Clinic
Family Health Team
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 595-1600 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1062 Klondike Rd
Ottawa ON  K2K 1X7
Canada
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-595-1600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robin Beardsley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beardsley ( CPSO# 58240 )

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 596-3321

Business Address:
1062 Klondike Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBIN MAUD BEARDSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEARDSLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1988