skip to content

Robertson, Susan June

CPSO#: 31308

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8309 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Baranick-Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Baranick ( CPSO# 31037 )
Dr. S. Robertson ( CPSO# 31308 )

Business Address:
Apple Tree Medical Clinic
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 25 Mar 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN JUNE ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1989