skip to content

Robertson, Kerri Duff

CPSO#: 21362

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jun 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-342-1052
Date Received: 09 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:22 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018