skip to content

Robert, Paul Francis

CPSO#: 29002

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Mar 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 684-4364
Fax: (905) 684-4466 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P. Robert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Robert ( CPSO# 29002 )

Business Address:
Glenridge Orthopaedics & Sports Medicine
547 Glendridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 684-4364


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL FRANCIS ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1977