skip to content

Fingerote, Robert Joel

CPSO#: 43860

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17-531 Atkinson Ave
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone: 905-763-3562
Fax: 905-763-0562 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thornhill Endoscopy Centre
390 Steeles Avenue West
unit 11&12
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: 905-882-6566
Fax: 905-882-6567
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

B19-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: 416-645-5145
Fax: 416-645-1401
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

B19-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: 416-645-5145
Fax: 416-645-1401
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Fingerote Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fingerote ( CPSO# 43860 )

Business Address:
360 Medical Centre
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone Number: (905) 763-3562

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOEL FINGEROTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINGEROTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 12 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018