skip to content

Robert, Christopher Eugene

CPSO#: 91879

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glenridge Orthopedics and
Sports Medicine
547 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 684-4364
Fax: (905) 684-4466 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C. Robert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Robert ( CPSO# 91879 )

Business Address:
Glenridge Orthopedics and Sports Medicine
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 684-4364

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:11 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EUGENE ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 20 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012