skip to content

Dmytryshyn, Robert Christopher

CPSO#: 59873

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University Of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060 Ext. 1-4
Fax: (416) 323-6402 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Enhanced Care Clinic
3865 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8W 0A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 354-2640
Fax: (647) 729-2008
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Dmytryshyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dmytryshyn ( CPSO# 59873 )

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 876-2383

Business Address:
Family Practice Health Centre
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
Enhanced Care Clinic
3865 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8W 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 354-2640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHRISTOPHER DMYTRYSHYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DMYTRYSHYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1989