skip to content

Robbins, Anthony James

CPSO#: 89783

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1415 1st Avenue west
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030 Ext. 215
Fax: (519)370-4055 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Robbins, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Robbins ( CPSO# 89783 )

Business Address:
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTHONY JAMES ROBBINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBBINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010