skip to content

Roach-Fox, Elizabeth Emily

CPSO#: 97997

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Roach, Elizabeth Emily (used until: 14 May 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Western Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 66120
Fax: 519-646-6357 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pathways Health Centre for Children
1240 Murphy Rd
Sarnia, ON
Sarnia ON  N7S 2Y6
Canada
Phone: 519-452-3471
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

MedPoint Walk-in Clinic
1240 Commissioners Rd W
London, ON
N6K1C7
London ON  N6K1C7
Canada
Phone: 5194724343
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Thames Valley Children's Centre
779 Base Line Road East
London ON  N6C 5Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8700
Fax: 519-685-8686
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Unit 302
510 Southdale Rd E
London ON  N6E 0B2
Canada
Phone: 226-663-7130
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:26 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH EMILY ROACH-FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROACH-FOX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Dec 2016