skip to content

Roach, Muriel Phyllis

CPSO#: 29903

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 May 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 May 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
150 SHERWAY DRIVE
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: 4162596671 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Muriel Roach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roach ( CPSO# 29903 )

Business Address:
Suite 900
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 671-9766

Business Address:
4763 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 224-8800

Business Address:
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (905) 278-7077

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 28 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURIEL PHYLLIS ROACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROACH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1978