skip to content

Rizvi, Syed Mohammad Hussain

CPSO#: 91997

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Aug 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Health Centre
Suite 110
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 252-4500
Fax: (519) 252-5600 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette
Department of Psychiatry,
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. X 3223
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Met campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L4
Canada
Phone: 519 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Rizvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizvi ( CPSO# 91997 )

Business Address:
Windsor Health Centre
Suite 110
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 252-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 May 2011

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011 Active
 
                  Dr.  Syed  Mohammad  Hussain Rizvi may practise medicine independently in
                  Psychiatry, only.