skip to content

Rizkalla, Michel

CPSO#: 94376

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:All Saints University of Medicine, Aruba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHEL RIZKALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZKALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 21 Nov 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - General Surgery

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2016 to 25 Sep 2016
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2020