skip to content

Rizk, Nada Nabil Anis

CPSO#: 88725

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French

Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Park Medical Clinic
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 5W6
Phone: (905) 257-1006
Fax: (905) 257-9141 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1750 the queensway
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5H5
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 626-5840
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nada Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rizk ( CPSO# 88725 )
Dr. S. Youssef ( CPSO# 111512)

Business Address:
Oak Park Medical Clinic
Oakville
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 6W5
Phone Number: (905) 257-1006

Business Address:
1750 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M9C 5H5
Phone Number: (416) 626-6363

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADA NABIL ANIS RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 03 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 04 May 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2010