skip to content

Rizk, Magdy Girgis Azmy

CPSO#: 90232

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
PO Box 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.M.R. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 90198 )
Dr. M. Rizk ( CPSO# 90232 )

Business Address:
Jeanne d'Arc Medical Centre
1887 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone Number: (613) 903-7563

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012 Active
             1.    Dr.  Magdy Girgis Azmy Rizk may practise medicine as a surgical assistant
                  in the operating room.

            2.    Dr. Rizk  will not be the most responsible physician for any patients and
                  he shall not provide any pre- or post-operative care.