skip to content

Rizk, Hany

CPSO#: 92786

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Division of Cardiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-748-4916
Fax: 613-748-4975 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hany Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mansour ( CPSO# 96063 )
Dr. H. Rizk ( CPSO# 92786 )

Business Address:
Montford Hospital
Division of Cardiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621


Corporation Name: Dr. Marlene Mansour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mansour ( CPSO# 96063 )
Dr. H. Rizk ( CPSO# 92786 )

Business Address:
Montford Hospital
Internal Medicine and Critical Care
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANY RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2015