skip to content

Rizk, Dalia Antoine Saad

CPSO#: 84815

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
252 DUNDAS St. East
Waterdown ON  L8B 0E7
Phone: 905 689 8886
Fax: (905) 6898830 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dalia Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rizk ( CPSO# 84815 )

Business Address:
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-3437

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DALIA ANTOINE SAAD RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008