skip to content

Rizek, Philippe N

CPSO#: 93198

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6858
Fax: 905-813-4229 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Genetics, 3rd Fl, South East Wing
4001 Leslie St.
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6345
Fax: (416) 756-6727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

89 Queensway West, Suite 500
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: 905-232-6556
Fax: 905-232-6557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Philippe Rizek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rizek ( CPSO# 93198 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Neurology Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
404-130 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V8
Phone Number: (905) 232-6556

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
3rd Floor
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE N RIZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Neurology

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015