skip to content

Riyaz, Samreen Hasan

CPSO#: 89937

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7758 Kent Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 7J9
Phone: (613) 498-3030
Fax: (866) 860-8155 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samreen Riyaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Riyaz ( CPSO# 89937 )

Business Address:
7758 Kent Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 7J9
Phone Number: (613) 498-3030


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMREEN HASAN RIYAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIYAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 19 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011