skip to content

Riyaz, Rehan Rahim

CPSO#: 92107

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 28 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
EL - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 09 May 2011 to 20 May 2011
EL - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 18 Jun 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2013