skip to content

Rivetna, Roxanna

CPSO#: 99582

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Nov 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1400 Provincial Road West
Windsor ON  N8W 5W1
Phone: (519) 969-7394
Fax: (519) 968-1949 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rivetna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rivetna ( CPSO# 99582 )

Business Address:
1400 Provincial Road West
Windsor ON  N8W 5W1
Phone Number: (519) 969-7394

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014 Active
             Dr. Roxanna Rivetna may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.