skip to content

Rivest-Caissy, Jean-Patrice Jr.

CPSO#: 101209

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Canadian Forces Health Services
Centre Borden
Canadian Forces Base
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424-1200 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.P. Rivest-Caissy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rivest-Caissy ( CPSO# 101209)

Business Address:
Canadian Forces Base Borden
31 Canadian Forces Health Services Centre
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 424-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN-PATRICE JR. RIVEST-CAISSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVEST-CAISSY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015