skip to content

Riopelle, Richard John

CPSO#: 22161

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20-174 Dufferin Rd
Ottawa ON  K1M 2A6
Phone: 613.421.7519 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN RIOPELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIOPELLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1977