skip to content

Riolo, Giovanna

CPSO#: 88681

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Road, Room 420
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 842-3366
Fax: (905) 842-1180 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, 6th floorBond Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5409
Fax: (416) 864-5949
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Riolo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:22 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GIOVANNA RIOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIOLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Nov 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012