skip to content

Ringrose, Heather MacGregor

CPSO#: 86486

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28 Sovereign Street East
Waterford ON  N0E 1Y0
Phone: (519) 443-7666
Fax: (519) 443-4441 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Heather M. Ringrose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ringrose ( CPSO# 86486 )

Business Address:
28 Sovereign Street East
Waterford ON  N0E 1Y0

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER MACGREGOR RINGROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINGROSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2010