skip to content

Rinfret, Stephane

CPSO#: 97233

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:23 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2013