skip to content

Rind, Ambreen

CPSO#: 91974

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Sind, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Suite E6-004A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ambreen Rind Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rind ( CPSO# 91974 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Suite E4302
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMBREEN RIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 27 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012