skip to content

Rimmington, Dale Peter

CPSO#: 85447

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Sep 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Aug 2006 to 13 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 14 Sep 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007