skip to content

Rigg, Wesley Donald

CPSO#: 23865

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 3 55 Hampden Road Nedlands WA 6009 Australia
Date Received: 24 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1969 to 14 Jun 1970
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2014