skip to content

Rigg, Kaitlynn

CPSO#: 100356

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
2nd Floor Room 252
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76993 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rigg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rigg ( CPSO# 100356)

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
2nd Floor Room 252
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAITLYNN RIGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIGG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018