skip to content

Rifkind, Aaron Wolfe

CPSO#: 26185

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Oct 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
826 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L6
Phone: (905) 549-6123
Fax: (905) 548-0770 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron Rifkind Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rifkind ( CPSO# 26185 )

Business Address:
826 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L6
Phone Number: (905) 549-6123

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:05 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON WOLFE RIFKIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIFKIND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1973