skip to content

Riesberry, Martha Anne

CPSO#: 97744

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 May 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 33089
RPO Ira Needles
Waterloo ON  N2T 2M9
Phone: 519-603-0724
Fax: 519-603-0725 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Martha Riesberry Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2019
Corporation Name: Dr. Martha A. Riesberry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Riesberry ( CPSO# 97744 )

Business Address:
P O Box 33089
RPO Ira Needles
Waterloo ON  N2T 2M9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Apr 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTHA ANNE RIESBERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIESBERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 08 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2014