skip to content

Riegert, Daniel Gerald

CPSO#: 30104

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M3 200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: 416-928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D. Riegert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Riegert ( CPSO# 30104 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M3-210 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4799

Business Address:
Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL GERALD RIEGERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEGERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Jun 1976 to 14 Jun 1977
Other - Rotating Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 31 Dec 1977
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978