skip to content

Riddle, Robert James

CPSO#: 25191

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 16, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 19, 2013, Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare notified the College that Dr. Robert J. Riddle's privileges were suspended, effective December 16, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: March 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert James Riddle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 23, 2016:

Dr. Riddle was the subject of a College investigation into allegations regarding his standard of practice and his conduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Riddle has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)