skip to content

Riddle, Christopher

CPSO#: 90753

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Riddle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Riddle ( CPSO# 90753 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4947

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RIDDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDDLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2011