skip to content

Richardson, Susan Elaine

CPSO#: 29524

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Wychwood Pk
Toronto ON  M6G 2V5
Phone: 4162685167 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas MacMillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Richardson ( CPSO# 29524 )
Dr. T. MacMillan ( CPSO# 90690 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
E W 8- 415
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective:12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELAINE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1986