skip to content

Richardson, Liliane Fauvette Odette Delaquerriere

CPSO#: 21777

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 11 Sep 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998